open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00112-1
    Party Name:USA v. Matthews
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reason for Amendment to Judgment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count/Case]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment Challenge (Post-Plea) re: Rehaif]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Terminating Counsel]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PreTrial]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest ]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Dismissal by Government - (MJ cases only)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:December 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Motions Referred]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:August 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:June 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:June 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Count/Case]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Prior to Hearing)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:December 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:April 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark Sealing/Unsealing Indictment]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restitution Questionnaire]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Reassignment or Recusal]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change Venue/Transfer Case]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Post Hearing)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Withdrawal of Pretrial Motions (SPM)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Withdrawal Pretrial Motion Hearing (Rules Motions)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:[A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Remark]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Bond Execution]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Examination or Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Notice]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to Appeal]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Revoke Bond]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Retroactive App.of Sentencing Guidelines re: Drug/Chemical Qty Tbl - Non-Disclosure]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114244
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =