open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00050-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gant
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter Lifting Suppression - Indictment/Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Dismissal by Government]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss by Government (indictment/defendant from case)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty to Lesser Offense]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Competency Hearing]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment (Fine/Costs/Restitution)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Psychiatric/Medical Exam]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Exam]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Notice]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Waiver (2014 Drug Guidelines - Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113687
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =