open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:97-cr-00259-13
    Party Name:USA v. Frazier et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ Report: Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification from USCA]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notification]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond (Set/Revoke/Forfeit)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:April 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Returned Executed/Unexecuted]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Waiver (2014 Drug Guidelines - Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Case and Appointing FPD (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation 22 Documents Received]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Eligibility Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Text Entry Only Information]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended(AO247): Order Regarding Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Retroactive App.of Sentencing Guidelines re: Drug/Chemical Qty Tbl - Non-Disclosure]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:February 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:February 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Payment Voucher for Attorney Appointment]
    Date Published:December 10, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark ]
    Date Published:November 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?98432
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =