open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:5:14-cr-06012-1
    Party Name:USA v. Degerald
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116787
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =