open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-46978
    Party Name:Hovis Engines and Parts Inc
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Resend Document]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor(s) or Trustee Proof of Claim]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Support/Supplement]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
    Date Published:December 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
    Date Published:December 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amended Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?376853
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =