open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:18-40628-btf7
    Party Name:Kimberly B Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Close BK Case - All Chapter 7]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Automated Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [-BR- Ch 7 Report of No Distribution - No Funds -BR-]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Certification About a Financial Management Course (FMC)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Installment Filing Fee Payment - Ch 7]
    Date Published:April 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Filing Fees in Installments GRANTED - atty]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Affidavit re: NO Tax Returns]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Evidence of NO Employer Payments]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certification re Rights & Responsibilities Agreement (text only)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (NOT Financial Mgmt)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee Tansfer Event for ADI]
    Date Published:February 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Turnover Tax Return (batch)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Generic Order]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amend Plan]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw As Attorney]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Corrected PDF]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw or Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Terminate Wage Withholding (by Debtor)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Notice of Lack of Feasibility (batch)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Wage Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?375063
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =