open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-48043
    Party Name:Kimberly Dawn Alexander
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Order on Debtor's Motion to Terminate Wage Withholding]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Terminate Wage Withholding (by Debtor)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amend Plan]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Wage Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?378241
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =