open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-48995
    Party Name:Robert J Adams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Wage Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?379357
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =