open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-21139-drd13
    Party Name:Leila Rae Cavender - BELOW MED
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ntc Final Cure Mortgage Payment APPROVED]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response in Agreement to Ntc of Final Cure Pmt Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Compensation -Granted (o)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Compensation]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Withdraw As Attorney (o)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Withdraw As Attorney]
    Date Published:October 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Creditor Attorney - text only]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Withdraw Document (text entry)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document Attorney Service]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Retain or Spend ALL of Income Tax Refund]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Determination of Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (o)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Determine Mortgage Fees and Expenses re: Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Post-petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?315735
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =