open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-43359-drd13
    Party Name:Quincy Alexander Martin and Tierza Crishea Martin - ABOVE MED
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 11/12/13]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (DISMISSAL)(m)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document TRUSTEE Service]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Confirming Amended 13 Plan (NOT initial)(tm)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Amd Direct Employer Pay]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing Called and Continued]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document Attorney Service]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Pmts]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion Dismiss Case for Default]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post Confirmation Fees (o)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Returned Mail - text entry]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Address Added or Changed - text entry]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Extend Time]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?315666
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =