open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-43069-abf7
    Party Name:Edward Gary Johnson and Linda Ann Johnson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Close BK Case - All Chapter 7]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Final Account Zero Balance (TDR)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Relief from Stay (Rule 4001)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Relief from Stay (Fee Due)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Notice of Appearance of Creditor Attorney - text entry]
    Date Published:October 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Order Approving Final Report & Distribution]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Final Asset Report (TFR)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Enslein, Jerald S. [Request for Notices by Pro Se Creditor only]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?314982
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =