open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:12-60426-can13
    Party Name:Merlin E. Phipps and Shirley M. Phipps - BELOW MED
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Case Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Request to Redact or Restrict Document (Fee Due)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Request to Redact or Restrict Document (Fee Due) - text entry]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Striking Doc - wrong case]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certification About a Financial Management Course (FMC)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Springfield Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion to Dismiss Case for 1322d]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion Dismiss Case for Default]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?288357
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =