open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-47813
    Party Name:Jessica Erica Thornburgh
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Certification and Dismissal Request]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Notice of Lack of Feasibility (batch)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?377961
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =