open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-20271
    Party Name:Martie Gibson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Debtor(s) or Trustee Proof of Claim]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?377964
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =