open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:15-10736
    Party Name:Nellie Maye Morris
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Correspondence]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Creditor Request for Notices (M)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [none]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Bounce Back E-mails]
    Date Published:April 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?369501
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =