Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:6:07-cr-03088-1
    Party Name:USA v. Claxton
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:April 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?83234
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =