open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cv-02539
    Party Name:Sutterer v. Trimac Transportation, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Scheduling Plan]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Requests for Admissions List]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal Case ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure of Organizational Interests]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal Petition]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174821
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =