open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cv-02982
    Party Name:Sturm v. A-1 Premium Acceptance, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appointment of Neutral]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Scheduling Plan]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure of Organizational Interests]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Order]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [CJRA Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?176349
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =