open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00900
    Party Name:Mallory v. AT&T
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Notice]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?149071
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =