U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nava
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.