U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:15-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamere
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • January 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.