U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00052-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Valdivia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 24, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.