U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:23-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Squier Rave v. The City of Kalispell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order/Judgment - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.