U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kegg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.