open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:15-cr-00362-1
    Party Name:USA v. Karfias
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Probationer]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Audio File]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?66077
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =