open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:15-cr-00350-1
    Party Name:USA v. Parks
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt (Other)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Sever]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Brief]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sever]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Unsealing Case]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark - Public]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report/Order Terminating Probation]
    Date Published:April 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - (USSC Amendment)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Right to Appeal]
    Date Published:June 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?65414
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =