open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:4:19-cr-03036-1
    Party Name:USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Restricted]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File - Restricted]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection To Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Unredacted]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of IFP Memo]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Brief]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forepersons Signature Page]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Retroactive Sentencing Worksheet - RESTRICTED]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - GO 2019-01]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reassignment Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Unsealing]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Satisfaction of Judgment]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing Review]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt (Other)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mandate/Judgment]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order/Judgment from USCA]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent/Order Regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release (PS 42)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Order]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Unsealing Case]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reassignment Order - Referral Judge (TEXT ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment - Revocation]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Right to Appeal]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Dismiss Defendant]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent/Order regarding Conditions of Release (Prob 12B)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report for Offender Under Supervision]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Strike]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 17.1 Hearing]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark - Public]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report/Order Terminating Probation]
    Date Published:September 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Returned Mail]
    Date Published:June 16, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (Crack Cocaine Offenses)]
    Date Published:June 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42319
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =