open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:13-cr-00403-1
    Party Name:USA v. Flying Hawk
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment - Revocation]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report for Offender Under Supervision]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64463
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =