open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:4:11-cv-03089
    Party Name:Bennie v. Munn et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibits Destroyed]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter regarding Certiorari]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mandate/Judgment]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Copy of Order from USCA]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opinion (Copy) of USCA]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Brief]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?55829
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =