open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:4:13-cv-03124
    Party Name:Wade Shows, Inc. v. YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Order]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Document]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Index]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63406
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =