open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:14-80509-
    Party Name:Mary Claire Gallagher
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Discharge (Chapter 7, 11, 13)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [9013-1 Notice]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Support Document]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Reopen Chapter 13 Case]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Payment through Internet]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Filing in a Closed Case]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Reinstate Case]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Close Bankruptcy Without Discharge]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Reminder - Certificate in Support of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Transfer/Assignment of Claim]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Response]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?153860
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =