open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-82259-
    Party Name:Todd A Anson and Andrea M Anson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Discharging Debtor and Closing Chapter 7 Case]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Discharging Trustee]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Corrective Entry - Linkage]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Affidavit]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Resistance]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 22A-2]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Order]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:September 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Order on Motion to Convert Chapter 13 to 7]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Terminate Party]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?152100
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =