open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:14-80778-
    Party Name:Ernestino J. Gonzalez and Lisa M. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Discharging Trustee]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Order on Motion to Convert Chapter 13 to 7]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Order on Motion to Convert Chapter 13 to 7]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Stipulation Regarding NOD]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Payment Default (batch)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of DEBTOR TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Limited Motion to Modify Chapter 13 Plan Post Confirmation]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Modify Ch13 Plan Post Confirmation (Limited)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?154401
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =