open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:14-40349-
    Party Name:Donald N Baker, Sr and Donna J Baker
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Final Account (Chapter 7 Asset)]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Summary of Final Report (Chapter 7 Asset)]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Case Trustee (Chapter 7 Asset)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Final Report-Asset/Aplc Compensation]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Fees & Expenses]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Entry - Re: Amended Motions]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Compensation]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Corrective Entry-Text Modified]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Employ]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?153608
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =