open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:10-82442-
    Party Name:William Edward Julien
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Courts Certificate Of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Administrative Order]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Order]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Sell Free & Clear Under Section 363(f)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Resistance]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Entry - Re: Withdrawal]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Objection]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Sell Free and Clear Under 11 U.S.C. Section 363(f) (Fee cannot be deferred)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Trustee's Resignation]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Comment of the UST Re: Fees]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Fees & Expenses]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Administrative Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Sell Free & Clear Under Section 363(f)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Objection]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Payment through Internet]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Sell Free and Clear Under 11 U.S.C. Section 363(f) (Fee cannot be deferred)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Hearing Cont]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Courts Certificate Of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Administrative Expenses]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Amend]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Brief]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Entry - Re: Withdrawal]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Seal Document]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Exhibit]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Reply]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Courts Certificate Of Mailing (text event)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Exhibit Record]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Denial of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Administrative Order Text Only]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Response]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Support Document]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Request to Discontinue Service of Notices]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Employ]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?132338
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =