open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:10-83284-
    Party Name:Lamar Jerome Davis and Megan Danielle Davis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Stipulation Regarding NOD]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Payment Default (batch)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Hearing Cont]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?134023
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =