open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:11-42701-
    Party Name:Kevin Michael Forsythe and Sharol Dawn Forsythe
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Transmittal of Unclaimed Funds]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Courts Certificate Of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Reminder - Certificate in Support of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Borrow]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?140645
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =