open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-40984-
    Party Name:Glenda Mae Glodowski
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Entry - Re: Withdrawal]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Discharging Trustee]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Hearing Cont]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Objection]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Support Document]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Terminate Party]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Order on Motion to Convert Chapter 13 to 7]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:June 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Intent to Cease Payments]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Administrative Order Text Only]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Administrative Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Post Confirmation Plan]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Entry - Re: Domestic Support Obligation]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Motion/Notice to Allow Claims (batch)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Amended Plan]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Amended Plan POST CONFIRMATION]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Hearing Cont]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Stipulation Regarding NOD]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Payment Default (batch)]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Entry - No Action On Plan]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of DEBTOR TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Payment through Internet]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:June 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:June 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:June 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?142767
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =