open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:10-cv-00318
    Party Name:Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v JBS USA
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Costs Taxed]
    Date Published:December 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Schedule for Initial Progression of a Civil Case]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Text Only]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter regarding Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attachment - Continued]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Brief]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Order Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice by Clerk of Missing Headers]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Index]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?53353
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =