open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-80315-
    Party Name:Chrystal Shenece Harrell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certification of ALC Fees]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Post Confirmation Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to POST-CONFIRMATION Plan]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Amended Plan POST CONFIRMATION]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Transfer/Assignment of Claim]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Limited Motion to Modify Chapter 13 Plan Post Confirmation]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of DEBTOR TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Modify Ch13 Plan Post Confirmation (Limited)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Stipulation Regarding NOD]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Payment Default (batch)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Motion/Notice to Allow Claims (batch)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Continued (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?154662
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =