open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-81213-
    Party Name:Heather Marie Johnson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Motion/Notice to Allow Claims (batch)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Request for Production]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Amended Plan]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Order Regarding Plan / Amended Plan]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Response]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Update Objection to Confirmation Deadline]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, Thomas D. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?154554
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =