open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-41599-
    Party Name:Shawn Paul Krueger
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Discharging Debtor and Closing Chapter 7 Case]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Discharging Trustee]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Terminate Party]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolf, John A. [Order on Motion to Convert Chapter 13 to 7]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Order on Motion to Convert Chapter 13 to 7]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Non-Compliance]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?151226
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =