open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-41011-
    Party Name:Marijana Sljivo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?175984
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =