U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-mc-00001
  • Case Name: Certificate of Good Standing
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Duplicate Attorney Admission Certificate (Use in Case 8:17-mc-0004 Only!)]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing (Use in Case 8:25-mc-00001 Only!)]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Certificate of Good Standing (Use in Case 8:24-mc-00001 Only!)]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Certificate of Good Standing (Use in Case 8:23-mc-00001 Only!)]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing (Use in Case 8:22-mc-00001 Only!)]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2021: [Certificate of Good Standing (Use in Case 8:21-mc-00001 Only!)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Certificate of Good Standing (Use in Case 8:21-mc-00001 Only!)]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
January, 2020
  • January 20, 2020: [Certificate of Good Standing (Use in Case 8:20-mc-00001 Only!)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.