U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-mj-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Remark - Public]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2020: [Audio File]
  • February 24, 2020: [Consular Notification]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 21, 2020: [Interpreter Request for Pretrial Hearings (TEXT ONLY)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 20, 2020: [Complaint]
  • February 20, 2020: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.