open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00358
    Party Name:Polak v. Laney
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Index]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?80573
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =