U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03124
  • Case Name: Grigg v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 31, 2025: [Substitute Party]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2022: [Statement]
  • August 23, 2022: [Declaration]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 23, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • August 13, 2022: [Declaration]
  • August 13, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 13, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 11, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 08, 2022: [Strike]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 15, 2022: [Certificate]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extend]
  • May 11, 2022: [Declaration]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response]
  • May 11, 2022: [Certificate]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Certificate]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Certificate]
  • January 27, 2022: [Certificate]
  • January 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 27, 2022: [Amend]
  • January 21, 2022: [Certificate]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • December 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Certificate]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order - Text Only]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 05, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Email Motion]
  • September 28, 2021: [Email]
  • September 17, 2021: [Returned Mail]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Attorney Letter]
  • August 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • July 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2021: [Attorney Letter]
  • June 23, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • June 23, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.