U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00381
  • Case Name: KONDOT S.A. v. DURON LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • January 10, 2022: [Return of Service]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order - Text Only]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 29, 2021: [Declaration]
  • September 29, 2021: [Attorney Letter]
  • September 29, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.