U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00288
  • Case Name: Ream et al v. Marker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Findings and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Index]
  • November 30, 2022: [Brief]
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Index]
  • September 13, 2022: [Compel]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Certificate]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • April 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 22, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.