U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03074
  • Case Name: Sandoval v. Peden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendation]
  • December 12, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Returned Mail]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Extend]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Place of Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • August 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - Consent]
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response]
  • August 19, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Index]
  • August 19, 2022: [Change Place of Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • August 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 12, 2022: [Summons Requested]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • May 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.